Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Deogracias S. I˝iguez, Jr.

Bishop Emeritus of Kalookan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1940 BornCotabato
23 Dec 196323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Malolos, Philippines
3 Jul 198544.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malolos, Philippines
3 Jul 198544.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Claternae
22 Aug 198544.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claternae
27 Dec 198949.0AppointedBishop of Iba, Philippines
28 Jun 200362.5AppointedBishop of Kalookan, Philippines
22 Aug 200362.7InstalledBishop of Kalookan, Philippines
25 Jan 201372.1ResignedBishop of Kalookan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Deogracias S. I˝iguez, Jr.:
Bishop Deogracias S. I˝iguez, Jr. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kalookan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalookan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013