Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carmelo Dominador Flores Morelos

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1930Born
3 Apr 195423.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 196736.3AppointedBishop of Butuan, Philippines
5 Jul 196736.5Ordained BishopBishop of Butuan, Philippines
8 Dec 199463.9AppointedArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
13 Nov 200675.9RetiredArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
17 Sep 201685.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Dominador Flores Morelos
Archbishop Carmelo Dominador Flores Morelos (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorsogon

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2006
  • d: CB, 17 Sep 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast