Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honesto Chaves Pacana, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Malaybalay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1933 BornCagayan de Oro
10 Jun 196532.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jan 199461.0AppointedBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
24 Mar 199461.2Ordained BishopBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
18 Feb 201077.1RetiredBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Honesto Chaves Pacana:
Bishop Honesto Chaves Pacana S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Malaybalay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Malaybalay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013