Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Raval Cruces

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1919BornLaoag
25 Mar 194424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Laoag, Philippines
2 Apr 196848.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
2 Apr 196848.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tambeae
24 Jul 196848.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tambeae
4 Mar 197050.4AppointedBishop of Ilagan, Philippines
22 Aug 197353.9AppointedArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
7 Dec 199475.2RetiredArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
4 Oct 199778.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco Raval Cruces:
Archbishop Francisco Raval Cruces (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013