Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kannikadass William Antony

Bishop Emeritus of Mysore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1965 Born
18 May 199328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mysore, India
25 Jan 201751.9AppointedBishop of Mysore, India
27 Feb 201752.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mysore, India
13 Jan 202458.8ResignedBishop of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for Kannikadass William Antony
(WikiData: Q28522936)
Bishop Kannikadass William Antony (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mysore

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolibeta, Diocese of Mysore
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph's, Cathedral, Mysore, Diocese of Mysore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mysore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 15 Feb 2017
  • c2+: CB, 21 Feb 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,344
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 13 Jan 2024