Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Calicut

Dioecesis Calicutensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 12 June 1923
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Verapoly
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 12,505 (4,830 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.calicutdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Malaparamba, Kozhikode-673009, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0495)237.03.13; 237.0271
  • Fax: 237.70.13

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
12 June 1923ErectedDiocese of Coimbatore
Diocese of Mangalore
Diocese of Mysore
Diocese of Calicut (erected)
31 December 1953Territory LostDiocese of Calicut Eparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
5 November 1998Territory LostDiocese of Calicut Diocese of Kannur (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195051,7983,550,0001.5%3551866026725135ap1951
195926,3363,700,000.7%3634703765935415ap1960
197028,0884,887,974.6%50511012787249715ap1971
198044,2696,526,000.7%55621173789088815ap1981
199051,3209,444,000.5%6763130394981,11817ap1991
199928,9907,565,397.4%4947963018766923ap2000
200023,0358,770,634.3%4644902558368050ap2001
200123,5268,770,634.3%4653992379269250ap2002
200224,7788,770,634.3%4848962588769043ap2003
200330,9098,826,998.4%4453973189269746ap2004
200435,1238,831,557.4%456010533410170946ap2005
200638,09210,061,127.4%43681113439272641ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013