Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Jean-Baptiste-Germain Feuga, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mysore

Titular Bishop of Furnos Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1886BornGoutz, France
29 Jun 191023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
18 Sep 191226.0ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Apr 194154.5AppointedBishop of Mysore, India
2 Jul 194154.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mysore, India
23 Oct 196276.1RetiredBishop of Mysore, India
23 Oct 196276.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
27 Jan 196477.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for René-Jean-Baptiste-Germain Feuga:
Bishop René-Jean-Baptiste-Germain Feuga M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mysore

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013