Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasile Bizău

Bishop of Maramureş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1969 BornDragomiresti
31 Aug 199727.9Ordained PriestPriest of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
20 Jun 200737.7SelectedCurial Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
27 Oct 200738.0ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
27 Oct 200738.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Appiaria
16 Dec 200738.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appiaria
11 Jun 201141.7ConfirmedBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
23 Jul 201141.8InstalledBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Vasile Bizău:
Bishop Vasile Bizău (born ) Bishop of Maramureş

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maramureş (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,579
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2011
  • i: CB, 25 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013