Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petru Pavel Aaron, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Făgăraş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1712³BornBistra
21 Jul 174331.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
4 Aug 174331.4Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
16 Sep 175240.5SelectedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
9 Apr 175341.0ConfirmedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
1 Sep 175442.4Ordained BishopBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
9 Mar 176452.0DiedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petru Pavel Aaron:
Bishop Petru Pavel Aaron O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Făgăraş

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 217
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015