Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanasie Rednic, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Făgăraş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1722³BornGiuleşti-Maramureş
174926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
3 Jan 176542.8SelectedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
22 Apr 176543.1ConfirmedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
13 Nov 176543.7InstalledBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
15 Nov 176543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
2 May 177250.2DiedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Atanasie Rednic:
Bishop Atanasie Rednic O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Făgăraş

  • a priest for 23.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 217
  • b: Website of the Diocese
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,605
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015