Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Constantin Giurgiu Patachi (Nemes de Pataky), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Făgăraş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1680³BornHorgospataka
23 Apr 170726.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 170727.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 171736.6ProfessedPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
3 Feb 172140.5AppointedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
17 Aug 172343.1Ordained BishopBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
29 Oct 172747.3DiedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ioan Constantin Giurgiu Patachi (Nemes de Pataky):
Bishop Ioan Constantin Giurgiu Patachi (Nemes de Pataky) O.S.B.M. (born Jul 1680, died ) Bishop of Făgăraş

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 203
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,161
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,118
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015