Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihai Cătălin Frăţilă

Bishop of Sfântul Vasile cel Mare de Bucureşti (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1970 BornAlba Iulia
11 Aug 199625.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 200736.5SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
27 Oct 200736.9ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
27 Oct 200736.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Novae
16 Dec 200737.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novae
29 May 201443.5ConfirmedBishop of Sfântul Vasile cel Mare de Bucureşti (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Mihai Cătălin Frăţilă:
Bishop Mihai Cătălin Frăţilă (born ) Bishop of Sfântul Vasile cel Mare de Bucureşti

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Sfântul Vasile cel Mare de Bucureşti (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,578
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 May 2014