Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cava e Sarno

Dioecesis Cavensis et Sarnensis

United

To: Diocese of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cava (de’ Tirreni)
7 August 1394ErectedDiocese of Cava (de’ Tirreni) (erected)
Diocese of Cava e Sarno
27 June 1818UnitedDiocese of Cava (de’ Tirreni)
Diocese of Sarno
Diocese of Cava e Sarno
30 September 1986UnitedArchdiocese of Amalfi
Diocese of Cava e Sarno
Archdiocese of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Cava e Sarno
Diocese of Nocera de’ Pagani
Diocese of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cava e Sarno
1949100,500100,500100.0%7238110913305944ap1951
1959109,000109,26899.8%5838961,1354815145ap1960
1970122,640122,681100.0%4743901,3625513249ap1971
1980126,327127,91998.8%4046861,4685011650ap1981

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014