Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pignatelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660BornNapoli
17 Dec 169637.0AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
21 Dec 169637.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
22 Mar 170343.2DiedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Pignatelli:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pignatelli C.R. (died ) Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013