Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Alamagna Cardona

Deceased

Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1572AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
19 Oct 1572Ordained BishopBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
28 Sep 1606DiedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

MicroData Summary for César Alamagna Cardona
Bishop César Alamagna Cardona (died ) Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopXII Apostles, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 161
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 21, Number 88
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 82, Number 496
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast