Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Caselli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1542AppointedBishop of San Leone, Italy
27 Oct 1544AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
7 May 1548AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
3 Oct 1550AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
1572¹DiedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Caselli:
Bishop Tommaso Caselli O.P. Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 161, and Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013