Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Bellacosa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cava e Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1781³BornNaples
31 Dec 180322.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 183453.1SelectedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
23 Jun 183453.4ConfirmedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
30 Jun 183453.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
15 Sep 184362.6ResignedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
17 Mar 185574.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cava e Sarno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Bellacosa:
Bishop Tommaso Bellacosa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cava e Sarno

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013