Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Carrano

Deceased

Bishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1809Born
17 Dec 183122.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 187465.2AppointedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
3 Apr 189081.0DiedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Carrano
Bishop Giuseppe Carrano (born , died ) Bishop of Cava e Sarno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiano
Ordained BishopSalerno, Archdiocese of Salerno (-Acerno)

  • a priest for 58.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 194
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,874, Number 36
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,085

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast