Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelotto Cardinal Fosco

Deceased

Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1378²Born
4 Feb 141840.0AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
20 Nov 141840.8Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
22 May 142648.3AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
11 Jul 142850.5InstalledBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
19 Sep 143153.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 143153.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
12 Sep 144466.6DiedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelotto Fosco
Angelotto Cardinal Fosco (born 1378, died ) Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopMantua
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,122
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 638
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 87, and Page 179
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Aug 2021

Quantcast