Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Toamasina

Archidioecesis Toamasinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Désiré Tsarahazana, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 February 2010
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 23,690 (9,150 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 11 rue du Commerce, B.P. 98, Toamasina 501, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (020)53.321.28
  • Fax: 53.330.53

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Vatomandry
18 June 1935ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
Prefecture Apostolic of Vatomandry (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tamatave
25 May 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Vatomandry Vicariate Apostolic of Tamatave
Diocese of Tamatave
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tamatave Diocese of Tamatave
9 April 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Fianarantsoa
Diocese of Tamatave
Diocese of Mananjary (erected)
Diocese of Toamasina
31 January 1990Name ChangedDiocese of Tamatave Diocese of Toamasina
Archdiocese of Toamasina
26 February 2010ElevatedDiocese of Toamasina Archdiocese of Toamasina

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Tamatave
195041,849371,50011.3%36361,16262372ap1951
Diocese of Tamatave
197074,009480,16915.4%451551,34559656ap1971
198088,237565,00015.6%732392,26253417ap1981
199084,240622,51713.5%835431,959558714ap1991
Diocese of Toamasina
1999299,0001,300,00023.0%5242910,310445722ap2000
2000304,9801,326,00023.0%932417,438425722ap2001
2001450,0001,620,00027.8%1341548,333635723ap2002
2002500,0001,730,00028.9%14264012,500506020ap2003
2003520,0001,740,00029.9%1439539,811605923ap2004
2004600,0001,800,00033.3%14324613,043656023ap2005
Archdiocese of Toamasina
2010616,9841,973,08931.3%20274713,127689219ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 2 Sep 2012