Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Pascal Andriantsoavina

Auxiliary Bishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar

Titular Bishop of Zallata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1969 Born
5 Aug 200031.3Ordained PriestPriest of Antananarivo, Madagascar
8 Jul 201950.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar
8 Jul 201950.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zallata
11 Aug 201950.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zallata

MicroData Summary for Jean Pascal Andriantsoavina
Bishop Jean Pascal Andriantsoavina (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Antananarivo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMitsinjo, Diocese of Majunga
Ordained BishopMahamasina stadium, Antananariveo, Archdiocese of Antananarivo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Antananarivo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 12 Jul 2019
  • c2+: CB, 11 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast