Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Ravitarivao

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tananarive, Madagascar

Titular Bishop of Arsennaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1916Born
1 Aug 194225.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 197256.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tananarive, Madagascar
18 Dec 197256.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsennaria
14 Apr 197356.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsennaria
1 Dec 198972.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tananarive, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Ravitarivao
Bishop Nicolas Ravitarivao (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tananarive

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoavinandriana
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de Lourdes, Church, Fihaonan, Diocese of Miarinarivo

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast