Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Lavigne, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1840Born
186423.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Dec 186626.9IncardinatedPriest of Society of Jesus
13 Sep 188747.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
13 Sep 188747.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
13 Nov 188747.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
10 May 188848.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
11 Jun 189656.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
8 May 189757.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Madagascar, Madagascar
27 Aug 189858.6AppointedBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
11 Jul 191373.5DiedBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Charles Lavigne
Bishop Charles Lavigne S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Trincomalee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarvejols, France
Ordained BishopLozere, Marvejols

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 384, and Page 566
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast