Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Le NoŽl du Perron

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹Born
28 Jan 163646.0AppointedBishop of AngoulÍme, France
14 Jun 163747.4Ordained BishopBishop of AngoulÍme, France
24 Aug 164656.6AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
14 Feb 164959.1DiedBishop of Evreux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Le NoŽl du Perron
Bishop Jacques Le NoŽl du Perron (born 1590, died ) Bishop of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-LŰ

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180, and Page 183
  • b/c2+: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1637, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast