Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe-François d’Albignac de Castelnau

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1742BornPeyreleau
2 May 178441.7SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
25 Jun 178441.8ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
18 Jul 178441.9Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
3 Jan 181471.4DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe-François d’Albignac de Castelnau:
Bishop Philippe-François d’Albignac de Castelnau (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a bishop for 29.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016