Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François du Verdier

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1687¹BornLimoges
3 Jul 173750.5SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
16 Dec 173750.9ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
9 Mar 173851.1Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
21 Sep 175366.7DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François du Verdier:
Bishop François du Verdier (born 1687, died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a bishop for 15.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015