Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Péricard

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹BornBasse-Nermandie
18 Feb 164728.1AppointedBishop of Angoulême, France
25 Aug 164728.6Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
29 Sep 168970.7DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Péricard:
Bishop François de Péricard (died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015