Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philibert Cardinal Babou de La BourdaisiŤre

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of AngoulÍme

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513BornBrisighella
13 Jan 153320.0AppointedBishop of AngoulÍme, France
26 Feb 156148.2Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156148.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
17 Nov 156451.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
4 Jun 156754.4ResignedBishop of AngoulÍme, France
14 May 156855.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
25 Jan 157057.1DiedBishop Emeritus of AngoulÍme, France

MicroData Summary for Philibert Babou de La BourdaisiŤre:
Cardinal Philibert Babou de La BourdaisiŤre (died ) Bishop Emeritus of AngoulÍme

  • a cardinal for 8.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013