Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hervé Marie Michel Gosselin

Bishop of Angoulême, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1956 Born
18 Sep 199438.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
9 Nov 201559.5AppointedBishop of Angoulême, France
10 Jan 201659.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Hervé Marie Michel Gosselin
Bishop Hervé Marie Michel Gosselin (born ) Bishop of Angoulême

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Angoulême.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2015
  • ob: AJ, 17 Nov 2015
  • c2: CB, 14 Dec 2015
  • c34: CB, 22 Dec 2015
  • mn: CB, 8 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,795

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast