Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Espiga e Infante, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Palawan

Titular Bishop of Aphnaeum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1912BornSanto Domingo de la Calzada, Spain
12 Sep 192916.9ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
27 Jul 193522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
8 Jul 195441.8AppointedPrefect of Palawan, Philippines
3 Jul 195542.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aphnaeum
3 Jul 195542.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Palawan, Philippines
10 Sep 195542.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aphnaeum
18 Dec 198775.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Palawan, Philippines
15 Apr 199784.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Palawan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Espiga e Infante:
Bishop Gregorio Espiga e Infante O.A.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Palawan

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 72
  • prof: CB, 24 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015