Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Mascariñas y Morgia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tagbilaran, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1897Born
14 Jun 192427.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193740.9AppointedBishop of Palo, Philippines
25 Mar 193841.1Ordained BishopBishop of Palo, Philippines
12 Nov 195154.8AppointedBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
3 Jul 197679.4RetiredBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
8 May 198083.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tagbilaran, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Manuel Mascariñas y Morgia
Bishop Manuel Mascariñas y Morgia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tagbilaran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntequera, Archdiocese of Cebu
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cebu, Archdiocese of Cebu

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 24
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast