Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Epifanio Surban Belmonte

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dumaguete, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1914Born
9 Apr 193824.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 195541.3AppointedBishop of Dumaguete, Philippines
24 Oct 195541.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dumaguete, Philippines
30 May 198975.1RetiredBishop of Dumaguete, Philippines
25 May 199076.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Dumaguete, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Epifanio Surban Belmonte
Bishop Epifanio Surban Belmonte (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dumaguete

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalolbon

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast