Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Wiesend

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Migirpa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1910BornKulmain
31 Jan 193726.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 196756.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 Jan 196756.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Migirpa
27 Mar 196756.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Migirpa
31 Aug 198575.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Mar 200392.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Martin Wiesend:
Bishop Martin Wiesend (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015