Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfons Karl Kempf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1912BornAlbstadt
28 Feb 193725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
27 Dec 195947.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
27 Dec 195947.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
25 Feb 196048.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limyra
18 Mar 198775.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
8 Nov 199987.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Alfons Karl Kempf:
Bishop Alfons Karl Kempf (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 10
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013