Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Douville

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1894Born
25 May 191924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
30 Nov 193945.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
30 Nov 193945.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vita
29 Jan 194045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vita
21 Mar 194247.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
27 Nov 194248.3SucceededBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
13 Jun 196772.8ResignedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
13 Jun 196772.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zattara
26 Nov 197076.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Zattara
5 Aug 198692.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Arthur Douville (VIAF: 191803605)
Bishop Arthur Douville (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Hyacinthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Casimir-de-Portneuf
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Death PlaceLaval
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 3
  • c1: CB, 18 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 1 Mar 2018