Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Alfred Langlois

Deceased

Bishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1876Born
25 May 190225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
14 Jul 192447.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
14 Jul 192447.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
23 Sep 192448.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
10 Jul 192649.8AppointedBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
12 Nov 192650.1InstalledBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
22 Sep 196690.0DiedBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Alfred Langlois
Bishop Joseph Alfred Langlois (born , died ) Bishop of Valleyfield

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Claire

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018