Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Harold Welsh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Spokane, Washington, USA

Titular Bishop of Aulon

Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1935Born
26 May 196227.3Ordained PriestPriest of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
6 Nov 197843.7AppointedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
14 Dec 197843.8Ordained BishopBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
17 Apr 199055.2ResignedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
5 Nov 199156.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
5 Nov 199156.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
13 Jan 199963.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Spokane, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Harold Welsh
Bishop Lawrence Harold Welsh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Spokane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWinton, WY, Diocese of Cheyenne, Wyoming
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Rapid City, Diocese of Rapid City, South Dakota
Ordained BishopSpokane, Diocese of Spokane, Washington
Death PlaceSaint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,456
  • c1: CB, 19 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 21 Oct 2022