Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Harmon Cozzens

Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

Titular Bishop of Bisica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1968 Born
23 Nov 199628.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
31 May 199728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
11 Oct 201345.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
11 Oct 201345.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
9 Dec 201345.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisica

MicroData Summary for Andrew Harmon Cozzens
Bishop Andrew Harmon Cozzens (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStamford, CT
Ordained DeaconSt. Mary's Chapel, Saint Paul, Seminary, Saint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota
Ordained PriestSaint Paul, Cathedral, Saint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Cathedral, Saint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Oct 2013
  • c3: CB, 16 Oct 2013
  • c34: CB, 20 Nov 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 158
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,991
  • c1: CB, 12 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast