Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Edward DeGrood

Bishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1965 Born
23 Nov 199631.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
31 May 199732.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
12 Dec 201954.8AppointedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
13 Feb 202054.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Donald Edward DeGrood
Bishop Donald Edward DeGrood (born ) Bishop of Sioux Falls

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaribault, MN
Ordained DeaconSt. Mary's Chapel, Saint Paul, Seminary, Saint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota
Ordained PriestSaint Paul, Cathedral, Saint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Sioux Falls, Diocese of Sioux Falls, South Dakota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sioux Falls.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019
  • ob/c1: CB, 12 Dec 2019
  • c2: CB, 19 Jan 2020
  • c34: CB, 4 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast