Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Darmanin, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Garissa, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1940 Born
26 Mar 196625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Feb 198443.2AppointedBishop of Garissa, Kenya
3 Jun 198443.5Ordained BishopBishop of Garissa, Kenya
8 Dec 201575.0RetiredBishop of Garissa, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Paul Darmanin
Bishop Paul Darmanin O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Garissa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Venera, Malta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Garissa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast