Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edwin Regan

Bishop Emeritus of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1935 Born
5 Jul 195923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
7 Nov 199458.8AppointedBishop of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain
13 Dec 199458.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain
27 Jun 201276.4RetiredBishop of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edwin Regan
Bishop Edwin Regan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wrexham

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort Talbot, West Glamorgan, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales
Ordained PriestSt. John, College, Waterford, County Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Sorrows, Cathedral, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Wrexham, Wales

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wrexham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,454
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2012
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 May 2018

Quantcast