Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Hannigan

Deceased

Bishop of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1928Born
27 Jun 195425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
13 Oct 198355.2AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
23 Nov 198355.3Ordained BishopBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
12 Feb 198758.5AppointedBishop of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain
6 Mar 199465.6DiedBishop of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Hannigan
Bishop James Hannigan (born , died ) Bishop of Wrexham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlenfinn, County Donegal, Diocese of Raphoe, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Sulpice, Seminary, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Sorrows, Cathedral, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Death PlaceCountess of Chester, Hospital, Chester, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Buried Place (Original)Wrexham, Cemetery, Ruabon Road, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Wrexham, Wales

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 114
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 26 Mar 2018