Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Joseph Conti

Archbishop Emeritus of Glasgow, Scotland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1934 BornElgin
26 Oct 195824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Feb 197742.9AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
3 May 197743.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Jan 200267.8AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Jul 201278.3RetiredArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Mario Joseph Conti:
Archbishop Mario Joseph Conti (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Glasgow

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Glasgow.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013