Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

Archidioecesis Sancti Ioannis Terrae Novae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Martin William Currie, Archbishop
  • James Hector MacDonald, C.S.C., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Alphonsus Liguori Penney, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 8 February 1904
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Newfoundland
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 16,641 (6,427 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Atlantic (Atlantique)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SJNd
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcsj.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 200 Military Road, St. John’s, NL A1C 2E8, Canada
  • Telephone: (709)726-3660
  • Fax: 726-3688

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Newfoundland
30 May 1784ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Newfoundland (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Newfoundland
5 January 1796ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Newfoundland Vicariate Apostolic of Newfoundland
Diocese of Newfoundland
4 June 1847ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Newfoundland Diocese of Newfoundland (erected)
29 February 1856Territory LostDiocese of Newfoundland Diocese of Harbour Grace (erected)
Diocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
29 February 1856Name ChangedDiocese of Newfoundland Diocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
9 May 1870Territory LostDiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland Prefecture Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s) (erected)
Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
8 February 1904ElevatedDiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
195060,000102,00058.8%55551,0905825937ap1951
196680,405147,34354.6%6613791,0178145041ap1967
196883,347146,20457.0%6213751,1117542339ap1971
197690,197171,74452.5%4519641,4098035239ap1977
1980117,862205,07957.5%5718751,5718433040ap1981
1990123,434209,19859.0%4917661,8705130144ap1991
1999115,857208,05655.7%4115562,0682925442ap2000
2000116,653210,73655.4%4316591,9772924644ap2001
2001118,205212,74555.6%4215572,0732125044ap2002
2002117,520216,57054.3%4012522,2602321840ap2003
2003118,995218,58754.4%3813512,3332321340ap2004
2004111,000213,00052.1%3933721,5414222040ap2005
2010111,000224,00049.6%4212542,05522016936ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013