Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Roleff

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Titular Bishop of Elaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1878BornUnna
6 Jun 190324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
7 Mar 193657.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
7 Mar 193657.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Elaea
26 Apr 193657.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elaea
5 Nov 196688.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Roleff:
Bishop Heinrich Roleff (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015