Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Justus Rarkowski, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1873Born
189622.5ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
9 Jan 189824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
7 Jan 193864.5AppointedBishop of Germany, Military
7 Jan 193864.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
20 Feb 193864.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
1 Feb 194571.6ResignedBishop of Germany, Military
9 Feb 195076.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

MicroData Summary for Franz Justus Rarkowski
Bishop Franz Justus Rarkowski S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlsztyn

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast