Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria (Honuphrius Maria) Lembo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1806BornSan Marco la Catola
19 Dec 182923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Mar 186053.9SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
23 Mar 186053.9ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
22 Apr 186054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
24 Jun 188377.2DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria (Honuphrius Maria) Lembo:
Bishop Luigi Maria (Honuphrius Maria) Lembo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013