Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Pinckney Northrop

Deceased

Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1842Born
25 Jun 186523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
16 Sep 188139.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
16 Sep 188139.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
8 Jan 188239.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
27 Jan 188340.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
27 Jan 188340.7AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
4 Feb 188845.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
7 Jun 191674.0DiedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Pinckney Northrop
Bishop Henry Pinckney Northrop (born , died ) Bishop of Charleston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharleston, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Buried Place (Original)St. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Charleston, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 183, and Page 484
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Mar 2017