Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Eugène Émile François Dixneuf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Titular Bishop of Vassinassa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1920BornRezé-lez-Nantes
23 Dec 194424.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 197252.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
27 Nov 197252.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vassinassa
14 Jan 197352.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vassinassa
27 Jun 197352.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Léon Eugène Émile François Dixneuf:
Bishop Léon Eugène Émile François Dixneuf (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013