Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Salazar Villagrana

Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1940 BornAmatlán de Cañas
21 Dec 196828.2Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
11 Mar 200867.4AppointedBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
14 May 200867.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
2 Apr 201675.5RetiredBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Felipe Salazar Villagrana
Bishop Felipe Salazar Villagrana (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Juan de los Lagos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,742
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 Apr 2016